THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:55:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
HOTEL DIEU SHAVER
MEDICINE
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-1381
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BANNON AND HAJ - AHMAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Haj-Ahmad (CPSO#: 121800 ) Dr. J. Bannon (CPSO#: 121690 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
HOTEL DIEU SHAVER
MEDICINE
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-1381
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BANNON AND HAJ - AHMAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Haj-Ahmad (CPSO#: 121800 ) Dr. J. Bannon (CPSO#: 121690 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY JAMES GEORGE BANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY JAMES GEORGE BANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020