THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:04:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Avenue
Hotel Dieu Shaver
Dept General Practice
Physician mailboxes
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056500344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BANNON AND HAJ - AHMAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Haj-Ahmad (CPSO#: 121800 ) Dr. J. Bannon (CPSO#: 121690 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Avenue
Hotel Dieu Shaver
Dept General Practice
Physician mailboxes
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056500344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BANNON AND HAJ - AHMAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Haj-Ahmad (CPSO#: 121800 ) Dr. J. Bannon (CPSO#: 121690 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILA MARIAN HAJ-AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJ-AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILA MARIAN HAJ-AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJ-AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020