THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:00:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64093 ) Dr. N. Sequeira (CPSO#: 122008 )
Business Address: 10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
(905) 495-4695
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 7891 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H8
(905) 459-4904
Business Address: 4350 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
(905) 812-1175
Business Address: 2250 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 1M8
9052700411
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64093 ) Dr. N. Sequeira (CPSO#: 122008 )
Business Address: 10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
(905) 495-4695
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 7891 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H8
(905) 459-4904
Business Address: 4350 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
(905) 812-1175
Business Address: 2250 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 1M8
9052700411
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SEQUEIRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SEQUEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEQUEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SEQUEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SEQUEIRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SEQUEIRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SEQUEIRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SEQUEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEQUEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SEQUEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SEQUEIRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SEQUEIRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020