THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 12:07:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Fed. do Rio Grande do Norte, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Murray St
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDRADE SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dos Santos Fernandes (CPSO#: 123555 ) Dr. S. Andrade Santos (CPSO#: 130553 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Fed. do Rio Grande do Norte, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Murray St
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDRADE SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dos Santos Fernandes (CPSO#: 123555 ) Dr. S. Andrade Santos (CPSO#: 130553 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Sep 2023
31 Aug 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HERMANN DOS SANTOS FERNANDES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 August, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HERMANN DOS SANTOS FERNANDES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DOS SANTOS FERNANDES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 August, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Fed. do Rio Grande do Norte, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2021