THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:03:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
19th Floor, Room 19 -104
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDRADE SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dos Santos Fernandes (CPSO#: 123555 ) Dr. S. Andrade Santos (CPSO#: 130553 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
19th Floor, Room 19 -104
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDRADE SANTOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dos Santos Fernandes (CPSO#: 123555 ) Dr. S. Andrade Santos (CPSO#: 130553 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY ANDRADE SANTOS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY ANDRADE SANTOS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ANDRADE SANTOS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 29 Feb 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
31 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jul 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 29 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 31 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Sep 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021