THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:54:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MQ. Khan and H. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 127889 ) Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 127589 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: London Health Sciences Center - University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MQ. Khan and H. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 127889 ) Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 127589 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: London Health Sciences Center - University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 02 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUMA SAEED may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Infectious Diseases, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. SAEED holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAEED no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAEED’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAEED’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SAEED's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUMA SAEED may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Infectious Diseases, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. SAEED holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAEED no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAEED’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAEED’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. SAEED's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021