THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 663 2913
Fax: 519 663 3549
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MQ. Khan and H. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 127889 ) Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 127589 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: London Health Sciences Center - University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 663 2913
Fax: 519 663 3549
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MQ. Khan and H. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 127889 ) Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 127589 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: London Health Sciences Center - University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMMAD QASIM KHAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. KHAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KHAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KHAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KHAN's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMMAD QASIM KHAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. KHAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KHAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KHAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KHAN's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021