THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:22:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RADHIKA KELKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RADHIKA KELKAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 31 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RADHIKA SUNEEL KELKAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. KELKAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KELKAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KELKAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KELKAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 March, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KELKAR's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RADHIKA SUNEEL KELKAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. KELKAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. KELKAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. KELKAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. KELKAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 March, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. KELKAR's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022