THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:47:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: B.J. Govt. Medical College, Pune, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: B.J. Govt. Medical College, Pune, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEYA ASHUTOSH PATWARDHAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PATWARDHAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. PATWARDHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PATWARDHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PATWARDHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PATWARDHAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PATWARDHAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 10 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEYA ASHUTOSH PATWARDHAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PATWARDHAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. PATWARDHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PATWARDHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PATWARDHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PATWARDHAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PATWARDHAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 10 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: B.J. Govt. Medical College, Pune, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
31 Mar 2025 to 10 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Mar 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
19 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 18 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
27 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurology
13 Apr 2022 to 26 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 31 Mar 2025 to 10 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 19 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 18 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 27 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 13 Apr 2022 to 26 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 10 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 10 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022