THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:56:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Room A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-685-8066
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-286-9036
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 842-7008
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Hospital
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Fax: 519-421-4238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. HASHMI & S. MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hashmi (CPSO#: 154240 ) Dr. S. Mahmood (CPSO#: 139275 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Unit A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
Unit B5-120
London Ontario N6A 4V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Room A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-685-8066
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-286-9036
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 842-7008
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Hospital
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Fax: 519-421-4238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 02 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. HASHMI & S. MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hashmi (CPSO#: 154240 ) Dr. S. Mahmood (CPSO#: 139275 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Unit A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
Unit B5-120
London Ontario N6A 4V2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 13 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SALMAN BIN MAHMOOD may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and nephrology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SALMAN BIN MAHMOOD may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and nephrology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2023