THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 09:12:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Endocrinology & Metabolism
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-646-6371
Fax: 519-646-6372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. HASHMI & S. MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hashmi (CPSO#: 154240 ) Dr. S. Mahmood (CPSO#: 139275 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Unit A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
Unit B5-120
London Ontario N6A 4V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Endocrinology & Metabolism
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-646-6371
Fax: 519-646-6372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. HASHMI & S. MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hashmi (CPSO#: 154240 ) Dr. S. Mahmood (CPSO#: 139275 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Unit A2-341
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
Unit B5-120
London Ontario N6A 4V2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HIBA ZIA HASHMI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HIBA ZIA HASHMI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024