THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:24:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 438 University Ave #200
Toronto ON M5G 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 762 0525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer (CPSO#: 31590 ) Dr. M. Saffer (CPSO#: 28170 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 438 University Ave #200
Toronto ON M5G 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 762 0525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer (CPSO#: 31590 ) Dr. M. Saffer (CPSO#: 28170 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 1976