THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:48:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cohen, Linda Susan (Used Until: 27 Apr 1999)
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer (CPSO#: 31590 ) Dr. M. Saffer (CPSO#: 28170 )

General Information

Former Name: Cohen, Linda Susan (Used Until: 27 Apr 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer (CPSO#: 31590 ) Dr. M. Saffer (CPSO#: 28170 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1976