THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:42:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia V. Hinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson (CPSO#: 28932 ) Dr. P. Hinton (CPSO#: 50724 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
building b54-1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
(416) 635-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia V. Hinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson (CPSO#: 28932 ) Dr. P. Hinton (CPSO#: 50724 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
building b54-1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
(416) 635-2000

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 1977