THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
1133 Sheppard Avenue West, Building B54
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169497082
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia V. Hinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson (CPSO#: 28932 ) Dr. P. Hinton (CPSO#: 50724 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
building b54-1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
(416) 635-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
1133 Sheppard Avenue West, Building B54
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169497082
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia V. Hinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson (CPSO#: 28932 ) Dr. P. Hinton (CPSO#: 50724 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Environmental Medicine Establishment
building b54-1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3K 0A1
(416) 635-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA VICTORIA HINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA VICTORIA HINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980