THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:21:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tanz Centre for Research
in Neurodegenerative Diseases
6th Floor 6KD417
60 Leonard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 0S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 507-6861
Fax: (416) 507-6435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop (CPSO#: 31657 ) Dr. V. Fried (CPSO#: 50598 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 962-2273
Business Address: Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 507-6861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tanz Centre for Research
in Neurodegenerative Diseases
6th Floor 6KD417
60 Leonard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 0S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 507-6861
Fax: (416) 507-6435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 28 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop (CPSO#: 31657 ) Dr. V. Fried (CPSO#: 50598 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 962-2273
Business Address: Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 507-6861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HENRY ST GEORGE-HYSLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST GEORGE-HYSLOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HENRY ST GEORGE-HYSLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST GEORGE-HYSLOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976