THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Yonge Street
Suite 616
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-962-2964
Fax: 416-962-2526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop (CPSO#: 31657 ) Dr. V. Fried (CPSO#: 50598 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 962-2273
Business Address: Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 507-6861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Yonge Street
Suite 616
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-962-2964
Fax: 416-962-2526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop (CPSO#: 31657 ) Dr. V. Fried (CPSO#: 50598 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 962-2273
Business Address: Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 507-6861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERONIKA ANDREA FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERONIKA ANDREA FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982