THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 14:39:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Bracebridge Court
London Ontario N5X 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-4984
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary S. Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brownstone (CPSO#: 50215 ) Dr. G. Simon (CPSO#: 53573 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Room C2-166 PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Bracebridge Court
London Ontario N5X 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-4984
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary S. Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brownstone (CPSO#: 50215 ) Dr. G. Simon (CPSO#: 53573 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Room C2-166 PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH FAYE BROWNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNSTONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH FAYE BROWNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNSTONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982