THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:51:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Room C2 166
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave. West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Phone: 519-436-2535
Extension: 5481
Fax: 519-352-6401
Address: Interface
220 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1S4
Phone: (519) 433-8333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pediatric Dentistry and Orthodontic
577 Oxford St. East
London Ontario N5Y 3H9
Phone: (519) 679-3450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Simon Dental Centre
16775 Younge Street
Suite 400
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8J4
Phone: (905) 830-1230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
395 Carrie St.
Strathroy Ontario N9G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary S. Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brownstone (CPSO#: 50215 ) Dr. G. Simon (CPSO#: 53573 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Room C2-166 PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Room C2 166
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave. West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Phone: 519-436-2535
Extension: 5481
Fax: 519-352-6401
Address: Interface
220 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1S4
Phone: (519) 433-8333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pediatric Dentistry and Orthodontic
577 Oxford St. East
London Ontario N5Y 3H9
Phone: (519) 679-3450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Simon Dental Centre
16775 Younge Street
Suite 400
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8J4
Phone: (905) 830-1230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
395 Carrie St.
Strathroy Ontario N9G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary S. Simon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brownstone (CPSO#: 50215 ) Dr. G. Simon (CPSO#: 53573 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Room C2-166 PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY SHERWIN SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY SHERWIN SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1983