THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 08:06:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-417-3451
Fax: 613-417-3452
Address: 205-2148 Carling Ave
iCare Surgical and Optical Centre
Ottawa ON K2A 1H1
Phone: 613-596-0300
Fax: 613-596-0848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 ) Dr. J. Farmer (CPSO#: 50523 )
Business Address: 3-725 Arlington Park Pl
KOVSC
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
613-417-3451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-417-3451
Fax: 613-417-3452
Address: 205-2148 Carling Ave
iCare Surgical and Optical Centre
Ottawa ON K2A 1H1
Phone: 613-596-0300
Fax: 613-596-0848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 ) Dr. J. Farmer (CPSO#: 50523 )
Business Address: 3-725 Arlington Park Pl
KOVSC
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
613-417-3451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK FARMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK FARMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979