THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:24:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
401 Smyth Road Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2732
Fax: (613) 738-4832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Le Saux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 ) Dr. J. Farmer (CPSO#: 50523 )
Business Address: 3-725 Arlington Park Pl
KOVSC
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
613-417-3451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
401 Smyth Road Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2732
Fax: (613) 738-4832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Le Saux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux (CPSO#: 50924 ) Dr. J. Farmer (CPSO#: 50523 )
Business Address: 3-725 Arlington Park Pl
KOVSC
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
613-417-3451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE ANNE LE SAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE SAUX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE ANNE LE SAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE SAUX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982