THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:38:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200
110 Copper Creek drive
Markham L6B 0P9
Markham Ontario L3P 7M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476960945
Fax: 365-5092154
Address: 30 Isabella St,
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1X1
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: 416 813-7079
Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: 416 813 7970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen and Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levin (CPSO#: 50931 ) Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 54475 )
Business Address: 30 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1
(416) 924-4640
Business Address: 250 - 20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0H1
(416) 924-4640 Extn: 3415
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7411
Business Address: 207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
200
Markham ON L6B 0P9
6476960945
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
6476960945

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, YIDDISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200
110 Copper Creek drive
Markham L6B 0P9
Markham Ontario L3P 7M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476960945
Fax: 365-5092154
Address: 30 Isabella St,
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1X1
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: 416 813-7079
Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7411
Fax: 416 813 7970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen and Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levin (CPSO#: 50931 ) Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 54475 )
Business Address: 30 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1
(416) 924-4640
Business Address: 250 - 20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0H1
(416) 924-4640 Extn: 3415
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7411
Business Address: 207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
200
Markham ON L6B 0P9
6476960945
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
6476960945

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEO LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEO LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982