THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen and Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levin (CPSO#: 50931 ) Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 54475 )
Business Address: 30 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1
(416) 924-4640
Business Address: 250 - 20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0H1
(416) 924-4640 Extn: 3415
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7411
Business Address: 207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
200
Markham ON L6B 0P9
6476960945
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
6476960945

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen and Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Levin (CPSO#: 50931 ) Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 54475 )
Business Address: 30 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1N1
(416) 924-4640
Business Address: 250 - 20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0H1
(416) 924-4640 Extn: 3415
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7411
Business Address: 207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 1B8
(905) 471-7787
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
200
Markham ON L6B 0P9
6476960945
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
6476960945

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984