THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:31:11 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipton (CPSO#: 58746 ) Dr. E. Warner (CPSO#: 52213 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-053
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4617

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, YIDDISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipton (CPSO#: 58746 ) Dr. E. Warner (CPSO#: 52213 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-053
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4617

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN WARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN WARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980