THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:31:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipton (CPSO#: 58746 ) Dr. E. Warner (CPSO#: 52213 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-053
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4617

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipton (CPSO#: 58746 ) Dr. E. Warner (CPSO#: 52213 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-053
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4617

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY HOWARD LIPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY HOWARD LIPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987