THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:08:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division Of Gastroenterology
Department Of Medicine
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Extension: 2332
Fax: (613) 544-3114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vanner (CPSO#: 52850 ) Dr. L. Flynn (CPSO#: 58587 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division Of Gastroenterology
Department Of Medicine
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Extension: 2332
Fax: (613) 544-3114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vanner (CPSO#: 52850 ) Dr. L. Flynn (CPSO#: 58587 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES VANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES VANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983