THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hopital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3522
Fax: 613 544-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vanner (CPSO#: 52850 ) Dr. L. Flynn (CPSO#: 58587 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hopital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3522
Fax: 613 544-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vanner (CPSO#: 52850 ) Dr. L. Flynn (CPSO#: 58587 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE VAUGHAN FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE VAUGHAN FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987