THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 23:41:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moodie Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moodie (CPSO#: 53795 ) Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 53355 )
Business Address: 722 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
(416) 743-6063

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moodie Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moodie (CPSO#: 53795 ) Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 53355 )
Business Address: 722 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
(416) 743-6063

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1983