THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:36:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moodie Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moodie (CPSO#: 53795 ) Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 53355 )
Business Address: 722 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
(416) 743-6063

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moodie Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moodie (CPSO#: 53795 ) Dr. P. Wong (CPSO#: 53355 )
Business Address: 722 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
(416) 743-6063

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY GAY MOODIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY GAY MOODIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 1984