THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:31:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Alpha Global IT GlobeMed environment hosted in Microsoft Azure Canada Central Toronto with Disaster Recovery Site in Canada East(Quebec City)
Azure Managed Services for Alpha Global IT provided by Aptum Technologies.
Contact Information:
Leslie Esau
Lead, Technical Support Services
Alpha Global iT
1262 Don Mills Road, Toronto ON M3B 2W7
Tel. 416 449 2166 Ext. 1253
Fax. 416 449 2543
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Schofield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schofield (CPSO#: 62836 ) Dr. J. Genik (CPSO#: 53599 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 806
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6951

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Genik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Alpha Global IT GlobeMed environment hosted in Microsoft Azure Canada Central Toronto with Disaster Recovery Site in Canada East(Quebec City)
Azure Managed Services for Alpha Global IT provided by Aptum Technologies.
Contact Information:
Leslie Esau
Lead, Technical Support Services
Alpha Global iT
1262 Don Mills Road, Toronto ON M3B 2W7
Tel. 416 449 2166 Ext. 1253
Fax. 416 449 2543
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Schofield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schofield (CPSO#: 62836 ) Dr. J. Genik (CPSO#: 53599 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 806
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6951

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Genik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1983
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1983