THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry rm 821
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto, On M2K 1E1
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6951
Fax: (416) 756-6080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Schofield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schofield (CPSO#: 62836 ) Dr. J. Genik (CPSO#: 53599 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 806
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6951

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry rm 821
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto, On M2K 1E1
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6951
Fax: (416) 756-6080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Schofield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schofield (CPSO#: 62836 ) Dr. J. Genik (CPSO#: 53599 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 806
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6951

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALLY ANN SCHOFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALLY ANN SCHOFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990