THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:16:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Extension: 100
Fax: 1-844-568-2931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Wallik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 )
Business Address: 3305 Harvester Road
Units 15 - 20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007

Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pintea (CPSO#: 78124 ) Dr. A. Gallaccio (CPSO#: 82590 ) Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 ) Dr. K. Walsh (CPSO#: 90905 ) Dr. G. Duncan (CPSO#: 66390 ) Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 ) Dr. L. Chalklin (CPSO#: 55848 )
Business Address: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Extension: 100
Fax: 1-844-568-2931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Wallik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 )
Business Address: 3305 Harvester Road
Units 15 - 20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007

Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pintea (CPSO#: 78124 ) Dr. A. Gallaccio (CPSO#: 82590 ) Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 ) Dr. K. Walsh (CPSO#: 90905 ) Dr. G. Duncan (CPSO#: 66390 ) Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 ) Dr. L. Chalklin (CPSO#: 55848 )
Business Address: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 108

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM WALLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM WALLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984