THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:37:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Caroline Family Health Team
3305 Harvester Road
Suites 15-20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: 1-844-568-2931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Christopher Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 )
Business Address: Caroline Family Health Team
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 207

Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pintea (CPSO#: 78124 ) Dr. A. Gallaccio (CPSO#: 82590 ) Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 ) Dr. K. Walsh (CPSO#: 90905 ) Dr. G. Duncan (CPSO#: 66390 ) Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 ) Dr. L. Chalklin (CPSO#: 55848 )
Business Address: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Caroline Family Health Team
3305 Harvester Road
Suites 15-20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: 1-844-568-2931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Christopher Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 )
Business Address: Caroline Family Health Team
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 207

Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pintea (CPSO#: 78124 ) Dr. A. Gallaccio (CPSO#: 82590 ) Dr. R. Williams (CPSO#: 73981 ) Dr. K. Walsh (CPSO#: 90905 ) Dr. G. Duncan (CPSO#: 66390 ) Dr. D. Wallik (CPSO#: 53982 ) Dr. L. Chalklin (CPSO#: 55848 )
Business Address: Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 632-8007 Extn: 108

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999