THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 10:14:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 2, 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613548-7827
Fax: 613-548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jones (CPSO#: 68910 ) Dr. L. Arellano (CPSO#: 54044 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 2, 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613548-7827
Fax: 613-548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jones (CPSO#: 68910 ) Dr. L. Arellano (CPSO#: 54044 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS RAMIRO JOSE ARELLANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARELLANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS RAMIRO JOSE ARELLANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARELLANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984