THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:27:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department Surgery
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2263788687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jones (CPSO#: 68910 ) Dr. L. Arellano (CPSO#: 54044 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department Surgery
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2263788687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jones (CPSO#: 68910 ) Dr. L. Arellano (CPSO#: 54044 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ANN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ANN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995