THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:00:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Charania (CPSO#: 59526 ) Dr. Z. Dhalla (CPSO#: 54148 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Charania (CPSO#: 59526 ) Dr. Z. Dhalla (CPSO#: 54148 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHIR ABDULSULTAN KASSAM DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHIR ABDULSULTAN KASSAM DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984