THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 825-8476
Fax: (613) 825-9045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Charania (CPSO#: 59526 ) Dr. Z. Dhalla (CPSO#: 54148 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 825-8476
Fax: (613) 825-9045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Charania (CPSO#: 59526 ) Dr. Z. Dhalla (CPSO#: 54148 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHIRA H CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHIRA H CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988