THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:50:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 779 Base Line Rd E
Thames Valley Children's Centre
London ON N6C 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8700
Fax: 519-685-8689
Address: Thames Valley Children's Center
779 Baseline Road East
London Ontario N6C 5Y6
Phone: (519) 685-8700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC, 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walker (CPSO#: 57634 ) Dr. J. McLean (CPSO#: 54360 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774
Business Address: TVCC
Business Address: 779 Base Line Road East
TVCC
London Ontario N6C 5Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 779 Base Line Rd E
Thames Valley Children's Centre
London ON N6C 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8700
Fax: 519-685-8689
Address: Thames Valley Children's Center
779 Baseline Road East
London Ontario N6C 5Y6
Phone: (519) 685-8700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC, 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walker (CPSO#: 57634 ) Dr. J. McLean (CPSO#: 54360 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774
Business Address: TVCC
Business Address: 779 Base Line Road East
TVCC
London Ontario N6C 5Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984