THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 08:43:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
PO Box 5010, Stn B
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Mar 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walker (CPSO#: 57634 ) Dr. J. McLean (CPSO#: 54360 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774
Business Address: TVCC
Business Address: 779 Base Line Road East
TVCC
London Ontario N6C 5Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital
PO Box 5010, Stn B
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Mar 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLean and Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walker (CPSO#: 57634 ) Dr. J. McLean (CPSO#: 54360 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Child and Parent Resource Inst
600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774
Business Address: TVCC
Business Address: 779 Base Line Road East
TVCC
London Ontario N6C 5Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYRIL ROBIN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYRIL ROBIN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1986