THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:58:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital (Civic Campus)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4892
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississippi Mills
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John Street Nort
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Dr
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
(613) 623-7720
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7290
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital (Civic Campus)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4892
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississippi Mills
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John Street Nort
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 St Francis Memorial Dr
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 27 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
(613) 623-7720
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7290
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE J. DENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENNIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE J. DENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENNIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985