THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:35:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H3401A
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7290
Fax: (613) 696-7303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
(613) 623-7720
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7290
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H3401A
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7290
Fax: (613) 696-7303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Business Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2B6
(613) 623-7720
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-4164
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dennie (CPSO#: 55436 ) Dr. F. Rubens (CPSO#: 55799 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7290
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRASER DOUGLAS RUBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRASER DOUGLAS RUBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985