THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 02:28:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: 104-720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
(905) 331-7888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: 104-720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
(905) 331-7888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET ZAMORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET ZAMORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985