THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:06:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 Guelph Line Suite 104
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 331 7888
Fax: (905) 331 0911

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: 104-720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
(905) 331-7888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 Guelph Line Suite 104
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 331 7888
Fax: (905) 331 0911

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zamora (CPSO#: 55633 ) Dr. J. Kovacs (CPSO#: 59751 )
Business Address: 104-720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 3M8
(905) 331-7888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES FRANCIS KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES FRANCIS KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988