THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:27:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology PMCRT 3-909
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3188
Fax: (416) 340-4021
Address: 229 Broadway, Unit 4
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
Phone: 519-943-0022
Fax: 519-943-0045
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St., Suite 5 East
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5658
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MyHealth Centre - Davisville
849 Yonge St, Suite 218
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-928-3467
Fax: 416-928-3502
Address: MyHealth Centre - Brichmount
462 Birchmount Rd, Unit 1B
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: 416-690-9441

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & M Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Orangeville
4-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Scarborough
1B-462 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 1NU-119
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Room L4-000
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Davisville
218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5-403
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: 1B-462 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 1-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: 218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, URDU
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology PMCRT 3-909
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3188
Fax: (416) 340-4021
Address: 229 Broadway, Unit 4
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
Phone: 519-943-0022
Fax: 519-943-0045
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St., Suite 5 East
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5658
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MyHealth Centre - Davisville
849 Yonge St, Suite 218
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-928-3467
Fax: 416-928-3502
Address: MyHealth Centre - Brichmount
462 Birchmount Rd, Unit 1B
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: 416-690-9441

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & M Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Orangeville
4-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Scarborough
1B-462 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 1NU-119
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Room L4-000
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Davisville
218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5-403
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: 1B-462 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 1-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: 218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSOOR HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSOOR HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986