THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & M Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Orangeville
4-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Scarborough
1B-462 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 1NU-119
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Room L4-000
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Davisville
218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5-403
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: 1B-462 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 1-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: 218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, URDU
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & M Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Orangeville
4-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Scarborough
1B-462 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 1NU-119
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Room L4-000
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: MyHealth Centre Davisville
218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 57388 ) Dr. A. Husain (CPSO#: 58439 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5-403
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5757
Business Address: 1B-462 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1N8
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 1-229 Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1K4
(519) 943-0022
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3188
Business Address: 218-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 928-3467
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 7884

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987