THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:45:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kawartha Dental Clinic
250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
Phone: (705) 743-1851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutton (CPSO#: 58076 ) Dr. J. Scott (CPSO#: 58723 )
Business Address: Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
(705) 743-1851

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kawartha Dental Clinic
250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
Phone: (705) 743-1851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutton (CPSO#: 58076 ) Dr. J. Scott (CPSO#: 58723 )
Business Address: Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
(705) 743-1851

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANK HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANK HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987