THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 10:06:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 5038
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutton (CPSO#: 58076 ) Dr. J. Scott (CPSO#: 58723 )
Business Address: Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
(705) 743-1851

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Extension: 5038
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutton and Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hutton (CPSO#: 58076 ) Dr. J. Scott (CPSO#: 58723 )
Business Address: Peterbrough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 250 Reid Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3R1
(705) 743-1851

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIME MARIE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIME MARIE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987