THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 08:09:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Center
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 722 6521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 311 McArthur Ave
Canadian Mental Health Association Ottawa
Vanier ON K1L 8M3
Phone: 613 737 7791
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mercer (CPSO#: 58605 ) Dr. J. Mercer (CPSO#: 66552 )
Business Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Center
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 722 6521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 311 McArthur Ave
Canadian Mental Health Association Ottawa
Vanier ON K1L 8M3
Phone: 613 737 7791
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mercer (CPSO#: 58605 ) Dr. J. Mercer (CPSO#: 66552 )
Business Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEANNA MARIE MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEANNA MARIE MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987