THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-992-4581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mercer (CPSO#: 58605 ) Dr. J. Mercer (CPSO#: 66552 )
Business Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-992-4581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mercer (CPSO#: 58605 ) Dr. J. Mercer (CPSO#: 66552 )
Business Address: Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344
Business Address: 60 Moodie Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAY GORDON MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAY GORDON MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993