THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 21:04:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Philippines Inst. of Med Found, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Health Centre Guelph
100 Westmount Road
Guelph,N1H5H8
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-8246000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Best Value Optical
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
Phone: (519) 888-6655
Fax: (519) 888-6622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani (CPSO#: 59070 ) Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4378
Business Address: Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
(519) 888-6655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Philippines Inst. of Med Found, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Health Centre Guelph
100 Westmount Road
Guelph,N1H5H8
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-8246000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Best Value Optical
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
Phone: (519) 888-6655
Fax: (519) 888-6622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani (CPSO#: 59070 ) Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4378
Business Address: Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
(519) 888-6655

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Merle Ang Vojdani may:

(i) practise as a general practitioner in Oncology and as a hospitalist, only;

(ii) and also practise at Long Term Care and Retirement Home settings; and

(iii) perform assessments for the purpose of refraction for patients.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Merle Ang Vojdani may:

(i) practise as a general practitioner in Oncology and as a hospitalist, only;

(ii) and also practise at Long Term Care and Retirement Home settings; and

(iii) perform assessments for the purpose of refraction for patients.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Philippines Inst. of Med Found, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1987
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1987